+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
- Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
- Chambers FA336 withdrawn
- Chambers FA336 filed
- Motion to return to Select File withdrawn
On March 31, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 27, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 26, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 11, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 29, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 05, 2014
On January 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Natural Resources Committee
On January 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Chambers FA336
withdrawn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor