+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
- Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
On March 31, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 27, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER194 adopted
On March 25, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER194 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER194
On March 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 22, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 14, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 21, 2014
On January 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Urban Affairs Committee
On January 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Enrollment and Review ER194
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor