+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 06, 2016
On March 31, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 31, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST79
On March 23, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER216 adopted
On March 21, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER216 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER216
On March 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 23, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 14, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 22, 2016
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor