+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB673 amended into LB894 by AM2610
- Indefinitely postponed
On March 8, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Chambers AM2449 filed
On March 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Judiciary AM2244 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2244
On January 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 20, 2016
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor