+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB639 amended into LB1038 by AM2688
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM2025 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2025
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On January 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 03, 2015
On January 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor