+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 25, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 25, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
On April 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER29 adopted
On March 31, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER29 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER29
On March 28, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Business and Labor AM280 adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On February 27, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM280 filed
- Placed on General File with AM280
On February 14, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Lowe name added
On February 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 13, 2017
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor