+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 3, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on June 03, 2013
On May 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Seiler explanation of vote
On May 29, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 29, 2013
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4
- Chambers FA122 withdrawn
On May 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Chambers FA122 filed
On May 21, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST25
On May 15, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Davis AM1158 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER34 adopted
On May 7, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Davis AM1158 filed
On March 27, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER34
- Enrollment and Review ER34 filed
On March 25, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Carlson AM738 adopted
- Natural Resources AM298 adopted
On March 21, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Carlson AM738 pending
- Natural Resources AM298 pending
On March 20, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Carlson AM738 filed
On March 15, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Davis priority bill
On March 5, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Natural Resources AM298 filed
- Placed on General File with AM298
On February 25, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Dubas name added
On January 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 22, 2013
On January 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Natural Resources Committee
On January 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
Davis AM1158
adopted
Chambers FA122
withdrawn
Enrollment and Review ER34
adopted
Carlson AM738
adopted
Natural Resources AM298
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor