+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 11, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER89 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER89
On May 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Blood AM1350 adopted
- Blood AM1350 pending
- General Affairs AM1303 pending
- Larson MO129 Reconsider the vote on AM1350 filed
- Larson MO129 withdrawn
- General Affairs AM1303 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On May 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- General Affairs AM1303 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1303
On May 5, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Blood AM1350 filed
- Larson AM88 filed
- Larson AM87 filed
On May 4, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Larson AM86 filed
On March 6, 2017 in the Legislature:
- General Affairs priority bill
On February 3, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 13, 2017
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to General Affairs Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor