+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 24, 2013
On April 19, 2013 in the Legislature:
- McCoy explanation of vote
On April 18, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 18, 2013
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
On April 16, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER39 adopted
On April 4, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Appropriations AM641 adopted
- Lautenbaugh FA48 filed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Lautenbaugh FA48 withdrawn
- Placed on Select File with ER39
- Enrollment and Review ER39 filed
On March 18, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Appropriations AM641 filed
- Placed on General File with AM641
On March 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Appropriations priority bill
On February 12, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 25, 2013
On January 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor