+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 13, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 13, 2015
- Kolterman explanation of vote
On April 7, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 07, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Chambers MO81 withdrawn
On April 2, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO81 Bracket until June 5, 2015 filed
On March 31, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST19
On March 30, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Mello AM1032 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER50 adopted
- Schumacher AM1047 filed
- Schumacher AM1047 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 25, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Mello AM1032 filed
On March 17, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER50 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER50
On March 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Business and Labor AM232 adopted
- Business and Labor AM232 pending
On March 5, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor priority bill
On February 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM232 filed
- Placed on General File with AM232
On February 2, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 09, 2015
On January 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
Chambers MO81
withdrawn
ST19
adopted
Schumacher AM1047
adopted
Mello AM1032
adopted
Enrollment and Review ER50
adopted
Business and Labor AM232
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor