+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Wayne explanation of vote
On February 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 28, 2018
On February 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 23, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
On February 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 14, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER102 adopted
On January 24, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER102 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER102
On January 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 14, 2017
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor