+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Krist name added
On January 27, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 21, 2017
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Agriculture Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor