+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill.
On May 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1448 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1448
On February 20, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 01, 2013
On January 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor