+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Riepe AM1461 withdrawn
- Hansen AM1281 withdrawn
- Hansen AM1296 withdrawn
- Crawford AM1348 withdrawn
- Failed on Final Reading 29-17-3
On May 1, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 30, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Riepe AM1461 filed
On April 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Hansen MO95 Reconsider the vote taken on AM1412 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER84 adopted
- Nordquist AM1319 pending
- Kuehn AM1412 pending
- Kuehn AM1412 adopted
- Nordquist AM1318 lost
- Hansen MO95 withdrawn
- Nordquist AM1319 adopted
- Ebke MO96 Invoke cloture filed
- Ebke MO96 prevailed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 28, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Hansen AM1281 filed
- Hansen AM1296 filed
- Crawford AM1348 filed
- Kuehn AM1412 filed
On April 22, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Nordquist AM1318 filed
- Nordquist AM1319 filed
On April 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER84 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER84
On April 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Business and Labor AM526 adopted
- Business and Labor AM526 pending
On March 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Kuehn priority bill
On March 3, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Kuehn name added
On March 2, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Riepe name added
On February 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File with AM526
- Business and Labor AM526 filed
- Davis name added
- Coash name added
- Larson name added
- Bloomfield name added
On February 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Garrett name added
- Stinner name added
- Krist name added
- Watermeier name added
On February 10, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman name added
On January 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 02, 2015
On January 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (11)
Ebke MO96
prevailed
Hansen MO95
withdrawn
Riepe AM1461
withdrawn
Hansen AM1281
withdrawn
Hansen AM1296
withdrawn
Crawford AM1348
withdrawn
Kuehn AM1412
adopted
Nordquist AM1319
adopted
Nordquist AM1318
lost
Enrollment and Review ER84
adopted
Business and Labor AM526
adopted
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor