+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019
On May 2, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 02, 2019
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0
On April 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST15
On April 23, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Friesen AM1419 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER82 adopted
On April 17, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Friesen AM1419 filed
On April 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER82
- Enrollment and Review ER82 filed
On April 10, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Friesen AM1257 adopted
- Friesen AM1257 filed
- Revenue AM953 adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM953 filed
- Placed on General File with AM953
On March 19, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Murman priority bill
On March 6, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019
On January 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 22, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 2, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 49
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
April 23, 2019: AM 1419 Friesen
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 5
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Present - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Present - Not Voting
- Sara Howard: Present - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Excused - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Excused - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Present - Not Voting
- Tony Vargas: Present - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Brandt: Excused - Not Voting
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
April 10, 2019: AM 953 Revenue - AM 1257 Friesen
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 13
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Present - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Present - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Present - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Present - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Present - Not Voting
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
April 10, 2019: AM 953 Revenue
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 14
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Present - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Present - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Present - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Present - Not Voting
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
April 10, 2019: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 10
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Present - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Present - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Present - Not Voting
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Friesen
Type:
Primary Sponsor