+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 29, 2015
- Presented to Governor on May 29, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 41-4-4
On May 27, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Nordquist FA78 adopted
- Nordquist FA78 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER141 adopted
On May 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Natural Resources AM935 adopted
- Nordquist AM1660 withdrawn
- Friesen AM1666 withdrawn
- Friesen AM1743 filed
- Friesen AM1743 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Placed on Select File with ER141
- Enrollment and Review ER141 filed
On May 18, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Friesen AM1666 filed
- Nordquist AM1660 filed
On May 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Mello name added
On March 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Natural Resources AM935 filed
- Placed on General File with AM935
On March 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On February 9, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 11, 2015
On January 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Natural Resources Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
Nordquist FA78
adopted
Enrollment and Review ER141
adopted
Friesen AM1743
adopted
Friesen AM1666
withdrawn
Nordquist AM1660
withdrawn
Natural Resources AM935
adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor