+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 16, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Morfeld name added
On February 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hansen, M. name added
On January 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
Bostar
Type:
Primary Sponsor