+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 15, 2014
On April 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 37-3-9
On April 7, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 3, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER233 adopted
On April 2, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER233
- Enrollment and Review ER233 filed
On March 31, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Nelson AM2671 adopted
- Nelson AM2671 filed
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM810 adopted
- Harr FA287 withdrawn
- Correction
On March 27, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Karpisek AM2553 lost
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM810 pending
- Harr FA287 pending
- Harr FA286 filed
- Harr FA286 lost
- Harr FA287 filed
On March 26, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Karpisek AM2553 filed
On February 20, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Nelson priority bill
On January 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill.
On April 2, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM810 filed
- Placed on General File with AM810
On March 18, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On February 20, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 28, 2013
On January 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
Enrollment and Review ER233
adopted
Nelson AM2671
adopted
Harr FA287
withdrawn
Harr FA286
lost
Karpisek AM2553
lost
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor