+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 13, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 13, 2015
On May 7, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 07, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On April 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER77 adopted
On April 13, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER77 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER77
On April 9, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 11, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Stinner priority bill
On February 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 4, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 12, 2015
On January 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Enrollment and Review ER77
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor