+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Seiler explanation of vote
On May 29, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 29, 2013
- Presented to Governor on May 29, 2013
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-1-3
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On May 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST29
On May 22, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Ashford AM1507 adopted
- Ashford AM1507 filed
On May 16, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On May 15, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On May 9, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Ashford AM1507
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor