+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 28, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
On May 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015
On May 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6
On April 14, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 13, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 24, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor