+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 29, 2016, on AM2236
- Mello AM2236 filed
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
On February 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 12, 2015
On January 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor