+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 03, 2016
On February 29, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 29, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5
On February 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 17, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Kintner AM1991 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER159 adopted
On February 16, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Kintner AM1991 filed
On February 4, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER159
- Enrollment and Review ER159 filed
- Coash name added
On February 3, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Scheer AM762 adopted
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 11, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Scheer AM762 filed
On March 2, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 03, 2015
On January 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 8, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Scheer AM762
pending
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor