+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On April 13, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM2844 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2844
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On January 29, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 08, 2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Friesen
Type:
Primary Sponsor