+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 15, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
On May 9, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 08, 2017
On May 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On May 3, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST25
On May 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER79 adopted
- Pansing Brooks AM1221 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 27, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Pansing Brooks AM1221 filed
On April 25, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER79 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER79
On April 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On April 4, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 10, 2017
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor