+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019
On April 18, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 18, 2019
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0
On April 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 27, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 25, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 20, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On March 12, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 5, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 21, 2019
On January 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 22, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 49
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
March 25, 2019: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Excused - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Present - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Excused - Not Voting
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
+ − Sponsor
Morfeld
Type:
Primary Sponsor