+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
On May 9, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 08, 2017
On May 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
On May 3, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On May 2, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER77 adopted
On April 25, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER77 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER77
On April 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM658 adopted
On April 4, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM658 filed
- Placed on General File with AM658
On February 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 22, 2017
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor