+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB287 amended into LB506 by AM851
On April 26, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 26, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0
On April 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST4
On April 3, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Wishart AM851 adopted
On March 31, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Wishart AM851 filed
- Placed on Select File
On March 28, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Health and Human Services AM464 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Riepe name added
On March 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Bostelman name added
On March 7, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Health and Human Services AM464 filed
- Placed on General File with AM464
On March 6, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Albrecht priority bill
On February 14, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Hilkemann name added
- Hilgers name added
On February 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Halloran name added
On January 27, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman name added
- Notice of hearing for February 10, 2017
On January 24, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Quick name added
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction