+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 1, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Wayne explanation of vote
On February 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 28, 2018
On February 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 23, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
On February 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 14, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER100 adopted
On January 24, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER100
- Enrollment and Review ER100 filed
On January 22, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM208 adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 8, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM208 filed
- Placed on General File with AM208
On January 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 31, 2017
On January 19, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor