+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On April 7, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Conrad MO182 Invoke cloture filed
- Christensen FA301 pending
- Christensen FA301 pending
- Christensen FA301 pending
- Christensen FA301 pending
- Conrad AM2800 filed
- Conrad MO182 failed
On April 3, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Conrad AM2775 filed
- Christensen FA301 pending
- Judiciary AM2111 pending
On March 31, 2014 in the Legislature:
- McCoy FA296 filed
- McCoy FA299 filed
- McCoy FA298 filed
- McCoy FA297 filed
- McCoy MO163 Indefinitely postpone filed
- McCoy FA295 filed
- McCoy FA294 filed
- McCoy FA293 filed
- McCoy FA292 filed
- McCoy FA291 filed
- Christensen FA301 filed
- McCoy FA300 filed
- Christensen FA304 filed
- Christensen FA302 filed
- Christensen FA310 filed
- Nordquist name added
- Judiciary AM2111 filed
- Christensen FA303 filed
- Christensen FA311 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2111
- Christensen FA309 filed
- Christensen FA308 filed
- Christensen FA307 filed
- Christensen FA306 filed
- Christensen FA305 filed
On February 3, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Conrad priority bill
On January 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Dubas name added
On January 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill.
On March 6, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 14, 2013
On January 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 22, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (26)
Conrad MO182
failed
Conrad AM2800
pending
Conrad AM2775
pending
Judiciary AM2111
pending
Christensen FA311
pending
Christensen FA310
pending
Christensen FA309
pending
Christensen FA307
pending
Christensen FA308
pending
Christensen FA306
pending
Christensen FA305
pending
Christensen FA304
pending
Christensen FA303
pending
Christensen FA302
pending
Christensen FA301
pending
McCoy FA300
pending
McCoy FA299
pending
McCoy FA298
pending
McCoy FA297
pending
McCoy FA295
pending
McCoy FA296
pending
McCoy FA294
pending
McCoy FA292
pending
McCoy FA293
pending
McCoy FA291
pending
McCoy MO163
pending
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor