+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed
On March 30, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 29, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER221 adopted
- Harr AM2768 adopted
- Harr AM2768 filed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 23, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER221 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER221
On March 21, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 18, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor