+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 12, 2015
On March 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 06, 2015
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On February 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST9
On February 19, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Nordquist AM339 adopted
On February 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Nordquist AM339 filed
- Placed on Select File
On February 10, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 30, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 22, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 29, 2015
- Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
ST9
adopted
Nordquist AM339
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor