+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 4, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 2, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 10, 2021
On January 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Sponsor
Hansen, M.
Type:
Primary Sponsor