+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 4, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013
On May 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Seiler explanation of vote
On May 29, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 29, 2013
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6
- Chambers FA146 withdrawn
- Chambers FA110 withdrawn
On May 28, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Chambers FA146 filed
On May 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Returned to Select File for specific amendment
- Crawford AM1479 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment
- Chambers FA110 filed
- Placed on Final Reading Second
On May 21, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Crawford AM1479 filed
On April 25, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 2, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Crawford AM863 adopted
- Crawford AM863 filed
On March 28, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor