+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB428 amended into LB427 by AM739
On March 28, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Education AM369 filed
- Placed on General File with AM369
On January 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 30, 2017
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor