+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB419 amended into LB45 by AM32
On February 15, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Bill withdrawn
- McCollister MO23 prevailed
On January 27, 2017 in the Legislature:
- McCollister MO23 pending
- McCollister MO23 pending
- McCollister MO23 pending
On January 26, 2017 in the Legislature:
- McCollister MO23 Withdraw bill filed
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor