+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On March 5, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Coash AM2192 filed
On January 16, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Urban Affairs AM1642 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1642
On January 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill.
On February 4, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 12, 2013
On January 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Urban Affairs Committee
On January 22, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Coash AM2192
pending
Urban Affairs AM1642
pending
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor