+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB401 amended into LB91 by AM331
On March 29, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 20, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 02, 2017
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor