+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 15, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 14, 2018
On February 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 08, 2018
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
On January 30, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On January 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER92 adopted
On January 17, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER92
- Enrollment and Review ER92 filed
On January 9, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Wayne AM1507 adopted
On January 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Wayne AM1507 filed
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 1, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 23, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 31, 2017
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Urban Affairs Committee
On January 13, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor