+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021
On May 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 44-1-4
On May 18, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST33
On May 12, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 27, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On April 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM436 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On April 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- McCollister name added
On March 31, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Brandt name added
On March 17, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On March 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM436 filed
- Placed on General File with AM436
On January 27, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 04, 2021
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Excused - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
April 26, 2021: AM 436 Revenue
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Present - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Excused - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Present - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
April 26, 2021: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Present - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Excused - Not Voting
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Present - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes