+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 12, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Hunt MO123 Recommit to Revenue Committee filed
- Hansen, M. AM1585 filed
- Hunt MO118 Bracket until April 20, 2022 filed
- Wayne AM1565 filed
- Hunt AM1051 lost
- Morfeld AM1145 pending
- Morfeld AM1145 pending
- Hunt MO118 withdrawn
- Hunt MO123 pending
- Linehan MO124 withdrawn
- Hunt MO123 pending
- Linehan MO125 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed
- Cavanaugh, J. AM1173 filed
- Linehan MO125 failed
- Linehan MO124 Bracket until April 11, 2022 filed
On January 11, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Hunt AM1051 pending
- Revenue AM762 pending
- Cavanaugh, M. MO52 withdrawn
- Wayne AM1557 filed
On January 6, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Linehan priority bill
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On April 28, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM762 pending
- Hunt AM1051 pending
- Pahls MO53 Bracket until May 5, 2021 filed
- Wayne MO51 Bracket until May 1, 2021 filed
- Wayne MO51 withdrawn
- Cavanaugh, M. MO52 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed
- Cavanaugh, M. MO52 pending
- Linehan MO55 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7 Section 10 filed
- Pahls MO53 withdrawn
- Cavanaugh, M. MO52 pending
- Cavanaugh, M. MO54 Bracket until May 4, 2021 filed
- Cavanaugh, M. MO54 pending
- Cavanaugh, M. MO54 failed
- Cavanaugh, M. MO52 pending
- Linehan MO55 failed
- Morfeld AM1145 filed
On April 21, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Hunt AM1051 filed
On March 25, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM762 filed
- Placed on General File with AM762
On March 10, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Linehan priority bill
On February 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Groene name added
On February 9, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Aguilar name added
On January 20, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 28, 2021
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Linehan AM6 filed
- Linehan AM5 filed
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (4)
January 12, 2022: AM 762 Revenue - AM 1051 Hunt
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
January 12, 2022: AM 762 Revenue - AM 1145 Morfeld - MO 123 Hunt (Recommit) - MO 125 Linehan - CLOTURE
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 7
April 28, 2021: AM 1051 Hunt - MO 52 Cavanaugh, M. - RECOMMIT TO COMMITTEE - MO 54 Cavanaugh, M. - BRACKET UNTIL 5/4/21
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: No
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: No
- Dan Hughes: No
- Mark Kolterman: No
- Brett Lindstrom: No
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: No
- Matt Williams: No
- Joni Albrecht: No
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: No
- Tom Brewer: No
- Tom Briese: No
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: No
- Steve Halloran: No
- Mike Hilgers: No
- Lou Ann Linehan: No
- John Lowe: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: No
- Tony Vargas: No
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: No
- Anna Wishart: No
- Robert Clements: No
- John Arch: No
- Tom Brandt: Present - Not Voting
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: No
- Myron Dorn: No
- Tim Gragert: No
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: No
- Dave Murman: No
- Julie Slama: No
- Ben Hansen: No
- Raymond Aguilar: No
- Eliot Bostar: Present - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: No
- Terrell McKinney: No
- Rich Pahls: Present - Not Voting
- Rita Sanders: No
April 28, 2021: AM 762 Revenue - AM 1051 Hunt - MO 52 Cavanaugh, M. - RECOMMIT TO COMMITTEE - MO 55 Linehan - CLOTURE
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: No
- Curt Friesen: No
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: No
- Robert Hilkemann: No
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: No
- Adam Morfeld: No
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Present - Not Voting
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: No
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: No
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: No
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: No
- Machaela Cavanaugh: No
- Wendy DeBoer: No
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: No
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: No
- John Cavanaugh: No
- Jen Day: No
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: No
- Rich Pahls: No
- Rita Sanders: Yes