+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 4, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013
On May 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Seiler explanation of vote
On May 29, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 29, 2013
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
- Chambers FA108 withdrawn
On May 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Chambers FA108 filed
On March 25, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 1, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 28, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 25, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Chambers FA108
withdrawn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor