+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 19, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 15, 2013
On February 12, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 11, 2013
On February 11, 2013 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On February 6, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 5, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Hadley AM65 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER1 adopted
On January 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Hadley AM65 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER1 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER1
On January 28, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Dubas AM46 adopted
- Dubas AM46 filed
On January 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 15, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 22, 2013
On January 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 10, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor