+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On May 29, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB402 amended into LB343 by AM913
On April 20, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Baker AM987 adopted
- Education AM913 adopted
On March 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Baker AM987 filed
- Education AM913 filed
- Placed on General File with AM913
On March 12, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Kolowski priority bill
On January 26, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 03, 2015
On January 16, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Education AM913
adopted
Baker AM987
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor