+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 7, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 07, 2013
On May 2, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Bolz explanation of vote
- Presented to Governor on May 01, 2013
On May 1, 2013 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
On April 29, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On April 19, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 28, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 04, 2013
On January 22, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 17, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor