+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 26, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 24, 2021
On May 19, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 19, 2021
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-5-3
On April 9, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 8, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On April 7, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
- Date of introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: No
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: No
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: No
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: No
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Yes
- John Cavanaugh: Yes
- Jen Day: Yes
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Yes
- Rich Pahls: Yes
- Rita Sanders: Yes
April 8, 2021: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 13
Details:
+
−
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Excused - Not Voting
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Excused - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Excused - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Excused - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
- Raymond Aguilar: Yes
- Eliot Bostar: Excused - Not Voting
- John Cavanaugh: Excused - Not Voting
- Jen Day: Excused - Not Voting
- Michael Flood: Yes
- Terrell McKinney: Excused - Not Voting
- Rich Pahls: Excused - Not Voting
- Rita Sanders: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Williams
Type:
Primary Sponsor