+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 5, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 14, 2019
On January 28, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Halloran name added
On January 25, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Pansing Brooks name added
On January 18, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Brandt name added
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 16, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Sponsors (4)
Briese
Type:
Primary Sponsor