+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 1, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Wayne explanation of vote
On February 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 28, 2018
On February 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 23, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4
- Harr AM1877 withdrawn
- Harr AM1876 withdrawn
On February 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 14, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Friesen AM1610 adopted
- Harr AM1612 withdrawn
- Harr AM1611 withdrawn
- Harr AM1613 withdrawn
On February 12, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Harr AM1877 filed
- Harr AM1876 filed
On February 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER97 adopted
- Harr AM1613 pending
On January 24, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER97 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER97
On January 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Friesen AM1610 filed
- Harr AM1612 filed
- Harr AM1611 filed
- Harr AM1613 filed
On January 22, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Friesen AM1135 withdrawn
- Friesen AM1544 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 16, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Friesen AM1544 filed
On January 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Friesen AM1135 filed
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 1, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 27, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 06, 2017
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 12, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor