+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 20, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020
On February 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5
- Presented to Governor on February 13, 2020
On February 10, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 6, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Vargas AM2306 adopted
- Vargas AM2306 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER155 adopted
On January 29, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER155 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER155
On January 27, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM739 adopted
- Wayne name added
- Vargas AM2099 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 15, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Vargas AM2099 filed
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On March 19, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM739 filed
- Placed on General File with AM739
On February 5, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 13, 2019
On January 17, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 15, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Excused - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
February 6, 2020: AM 2306 Vargas
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Present - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Present - Not Voting
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Halloran: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Present - Not Voting
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Present - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
January 27, 2020: AM 739 Revenue - AM 2099 Vargas
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Present - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Present - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Halloran: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: No
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Excused - Not Voting
- Ben Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
January 27, 2020: AM 739 Revenue
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Present - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Present - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Present - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: No
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Excused - Not Voting
- Ben Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
January 27, 2020: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Excused - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: No
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Present - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Present - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Present - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Halloran: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Present - Not Voting
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Present - Not Voting
- Julie Slama: Excused - Not Voting
- Ben Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
+ − Sponsors (2)
Vargas
Type:
Primary Sponsor