+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 5, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB417 amended into LB299 by AM987
On May 20, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on May 16, 2013
On May 13, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on May 10, 2013
On May 10, 2013 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
On May 1, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST19
On April 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Murante AM1135 adopted
- Kolowski AM987 adopted
On April 24, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Murante AM1135 filed
On April 10, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Kolowski AM987 filed
On April 2, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 19, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On March 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Seiler priority bill
On February 21, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 05, 2013
On February 20, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 21, 2013 (cancel)
- Adams motion to suspend rules to permit cancellation of hearing prevailed
On February 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 21, 2013
On January 22, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 17, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Murante AM1135
adopted
Kolowski AM987
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor